Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4087 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R11445 YDB-D
 By: Farrar H.B. No. 4087


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an ultrasound machine registry;
 providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle G, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 325 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 325. ULTRASOUND MACHINES
 Sec. 325.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (3)  "Health care facility" means a facility authorized
 under the laws of this state to provide health care to patients.
 (4)  "Licensed practitioner" means a physician
 licensed in this state to practice medicine or a nurse or advance
 nurse practitioner licensed in this state to practice nursing.
 (5)  "Ultrasound machine" means a medical imaging
 device that uses high frequency sound waves and their echoes to
 provide treatment and testing of patients.
 Sec. 325.002.  RESTRICTED POSSESSION AND USE OF ULTRASOUND
 MACHINE. (a) A person may not purchase or possess an ultrasound
 machine for use in the provision of medical, nursing, or health care
 in this state unless the person is a licensed practitioner or is a
 health care facility that employs or has on staff at least one
 licensed practitioner.
 (b)  A person may not operate an ultrasound machine unless
 the person operates the machine under the supervision of a licensed
 practitioner or other properly trained health care professional who
 is able to perform and interpret the ultrasound.
 Sec. 325.003.  NOTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ULTRASOUND
 MACHINE. (a) A licensed practitioner or health care facility that
 purchases or takes possession of an ultrasound machine shall notify
 the department not later than the seventh day after the date the
 practitioner or facility takes possession of the machine.
 (b)  The notification required under Subsection (a) must be
 on the form prescribed by the department and must include:
 (1)  the name, address, and telephone number of the
 licensed practitioner or health care facility that took possession
 of the machine and the date the practitioner or facility took
 possession of the machine;
 (2) the type of machine;
 (3)  the address of the premises where the machine is
 used; and
 (4)  the name of each licensed practitioner who uses
 the machine.
 (c)  A licensed practitioner or health care facility that has
 possession of an ultrasound machine shall notify the department of
 any change in the information provided to the department under
 Subsection (b) not later than the seventh day after the date of the
 change.
 Sec. 325.004.  ESTABLISHMENT OF REGISTRY. The department
 shall establish a central registry of ultrasound machines and
 include in the registry the information submitted to the department
 under Section 325.003.
 Sec. 325.005.  INSPECTION; RECORDS. (a) The department or
 the department's representative may enter public or private
 property at reasonable times to determine whether, in a matter
 under the department's jurisdiction, a person is complying with
 this chapter and department rules.
 (b)  A licensed practitioner or health care facility
 required to submit notification under Section 325.003 shall retain
 a copy of all maintenance records and records relating to the use,
 receipt, storage, transfer, or disposal of an ultrasound machine as
 provided by department rules.
 Sec. 325.006.  RULES. The executive commissioner shall
 adopt rules necessary to implement this chapter, including rules on
 inspections and on maintenance of records.
 Sec. 325.007.  CIVIL PENALTY. (a) A person who violates
 this chapter or any rule adopted under this chapter is liable to
 this state for a civil penalty of $1,000 for each violation. Each
 day a violation continues constitutes a separate violation.
 (b) The amount of the penalty shall be based on:
 (1) the seriousness of the violation;
 (2) the history of previous violations;
 (3)  the amount necessary to deter a future violation;
 and
 (4) any other matter that justice may require.
 (c)  The department or the attorney general may sue to
 collect a civil penalty under this section. In the suit the state
 may recover the reasonable expenses incurred in obtaining the
 penalty, including investigation and court costs, reasonable
 attorney's fees, witness fees, and other expenses.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than November 1, 2009, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall adopt the rules required by Chapter 325, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) Not later than December 31, 2009, the Department of
 State Health Services shall prescribe the form required under
 Section 325.003, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, and
 establish the registry required by Section 325.004, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Chapter 325, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, a licensed practitioner or health care
 facility is not required to submit the notification required by
 Section 325.003, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
 before January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.