Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 2181 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2181 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2106 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2595 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | RV#600 | Journal Page: 2594 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2531 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2531 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Amended | 2-Villarreal | Journal Page: 2527 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2526 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2526 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 846 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 846 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |