House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1197 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 847 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 847 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |