House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 2283 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 867 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 867 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |