Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4149 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 4149


 AN ACT
 relating to certain studies and reports by the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board regarding achievable cost-saving
 measures and the use and availability of electronic textbooks at
 institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0664 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0664.  STUDY OF ACHIEVABLE COST-SAVING MEASURES;
 REPORT.  (a) The board shall conduct a study to identify achievable
 cost-saving measures in the management and operation of
 institutions of higher education.
 (b)  Not later than January 31, 2011, the board shall report
 the results of the study required by Subsection (a) to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 presiding officer for each legislative standing committee with
 primary jurisdiction over higher education. The report must
 include:
 (1)  the board's recommendations concerning
 cost-saving measures that are achievable at institutions of higher
 education; and
 (2)  an estimate of the amount of money that would be
 saved during a five-year period through the implementation of each
 recommendation.
 (c) This section expires January 31, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0665 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0665.  STUDY ON USE AND AVAILABILITY OF ELECTRONIC
 TEXTBOOKS.  (a)  The board shall conduct a study and recommend
 policies regarding the use and availability of electronic textbooks
 in higher education in this state and in other states.  The study
 and policy recommendations must include a specific focus on the
 results of the pilot program implemented by The University of Texas
 at Austin with respect to the use of electronic textbooks and must
 address methods for encouraging the use of electronic textbooks at
 public or private institutions of higher education in this state.
 (b)  Each student regent serving under Section 51.355 or
 51.356 shall assist the board in performing the board's duties
 under Subsection (a).  The board shall establish procedures to
 assist a student regent in complying with this subsection.
 (c)  The board may solicit and accept gifts and grants from
 any public or private source to conduct the study and develop policy
 recommendations under this section.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the board shall make an
 initial report and recommendations based on the study to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and presiding officer of each legislative
 standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher
 education.  This subsection expires January 31, 2011.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4149 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4149 on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4149 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor