Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4218 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 4218
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to representation in a court proceeding involving a retail
 public utility providing water or sewer service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 13.042, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If a municipality exercises its jurisdiction under
 Subsection (a), the municipal attorney or other appropriate
 attorney representing the municipality shall represent the
 municipality under this chapter in all matters before the state
 courts and any court of the United States.
 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 13.042, Water Code, apply only to a court proceeding that commences
 on or after the effective date of this Act. A court proceeding that
 commences before the effective date of this Act is subject to the
 law in effect on the date the proceeding was commenced, and that law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *