House | 05/11/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3166 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 935 | Journal Page: 3166 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 810 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 315 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 315 | |
House | 12/17/2008 | Filed |