E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4310
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#400
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Ritter
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|