1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 4244 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to certain competitive scholarship recipients at public |
---|
6 | 6 | | institutions of higher education. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 51.969(c), Education Code, as added by |
---|
9 | 9 | | Chapter 422 (S.B. 1325), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular |
---|
10 | 10 | | Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (c) Before receiving [A person applying for] a scholarship |
---|
12 | 12 | | originating from and administered by an institution of higher |
---|
13 | 13 | | education or university system, a person must file a written |
---|
14 | 14 | | statement with the institution or system [the application] |
---|
15 | 15 | | indicating whether the person is related within the third degree by |
---|
16 | 16 | | consanguinity or the second degree by affinity to a current member |
---|
17 | 17 | | of the governing board of the institution or system. |
---|
18 | 18 | | SECTION 2. Section 54.064, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
19 | 19 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read |
---|
20 | 20 | | as follows: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (a) An institution of higher education may charge a |
---|
22 | 22 | | nonresident [A] student who holds a competitive scholarship of at |
---|
23 | 23 | | least $1,000 for the academic year or summer term for which the |
---|
24 | 24 | | student is enrolled resident tuition and fees [and who is either a |
---|
25 | 25 | | nonresident or a citizen of a country other than the United States |
---|
26 | 26 | | of America is entitled to pay the fees and charges required of Texas |
---|
27 | 27 | | residents] without regard to the length of time the student has |
---|
28 | 28 | | resided in Texas. The student must compete with other students, |
---|
29 | 29 | | including Texas residents, for the scholarship and the scholarship |
---|
30 | 30 | | must be awarded by a scholarship committee officially recognized by |
---|
31 | 31 | | the administration and be approved by the Texas Higher Education |
---|
32 | 32 | | Coordinating Board under criteria developed by the coordinating |
---|
33 | 33 | | board. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) A student who would be entitled to pay resident tuition |
---|
35 | 35 | | in the 2009-2010 academic year under this section as this section |
---|
36 | 36 | | existed on January 1, 2009, because the student is awarded a |
---|
37 | 37 | | competitive scholarship for that academic year in the amount |
---|
38 | 38 | | prescribed by Subsection (a) before the beginning of the 2009 fall |
---|
39 | 39 | | semester is entitled to continue to pay resident tuition under this |
---|
40 | 40 | | section as this section existed on January 1, 2009, in each semester |
---|
41 | 41 | | or other term in which the student is awarded such a scholarship, as |
---|
42 | 42 | | long as the student remains enrolled in the same certificate or |
---|
43 | 43 | | degree program. This subsection expires August 1, 2014. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (d) The difference between tuition charged to the student |
---|
45 | 45 | | under this section and the tuition the student would be charged if |
---|
46 | 46 | | this section did not apply to the student shall not be accounted for |
---|
47 | 47 | | in such a way as to reduce the general revenue appropriation to an |
---|
48 | 48 | | institution of higher education that charges a nonresident student |
---|
49 | 49 | | resident tuition and fees under this section. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
51 | 51 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
52 | 52 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
53 | 53 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
54 | 54 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
55 | 55 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
56 | 56 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
57 | 57 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4244 was passed by the House on May 5, |
---|
58 | 58 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
59 | 59 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
60 | 60 | | H.B. No. 4244 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
61 | 61 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
62 | 62 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
63 | 63 | | on H.B. No. 4244 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, |
---|
64 | 64 | | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
65 | 65 | | ______________________________ |
---|
66 | 66 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
67 | 67 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4244 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
68 | 68 | | amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
69 | 69 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
70 | 70 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
71 | 71 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
72 | 72 | | 4244 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
73 | 73 | | ______________________________ |
---|
74 | 74 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
75 | 75 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
76 | 76 | | Date |
---|
77 | 77 | | __________________ |
---|
78 | 78 | | Governor |
---|