Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4265 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Howard of Fort Bend, Paxton H.B. No. 4265
 (Senate Sponsor - Averitt)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 25, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 25, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4265 By: Averitt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of controlling interest for purposes of
 the franchise tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 171.0001(8), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (8) "Controlling interest" means:
 (A) for a corporation, either more than 50
 percent, owned directly or indirectly, of the total combined voting
 power of all classes of stock of the corporation, or more than 50
 percent, owned directly or indirectly, of the beneficial ownership
 interest in the voting stock of the corporation;
 (B) for a partnership, [association, trust, or
 other entity other than a limited liability company,] more than 50
 percent, owned directly or indirectly, of the capital or[,]
 profits[, or beneficial] interest in the partnership[,
 association, trust, or other entity]; [and]
 (C) for an association [for a limited liability
 company], [either] more than 50 percent, owned directly or
 indirectly, of the capital or profits interest in the association;
 (D)  for a trust, more than 50 percent, owned
 directly or indirectly, of the current beneficial interest in the
 trust corpus or income;
 (E) for a limited liability company, either:
 (i)  more than 50 percent, owned directly or
 indirectly, of the total membership interest of the limited
 liability company; or
 (ii)  more than 50 percent, owned directly
 or indirectly, of the beneficial ownership interest in the
 membership interest of the limited liability company; or
 (F)  for any other entity, more than 50 percent,
 owned directly or indirectly, of the capital or profits interest in
 the entity [total membership interest of the limited liability
 company or more than 50 percent, owned directly or indirectly, of
 the beneficial ownership interest in the membership interest of the
 limited liability company].
 SECTION 2. This Act applies only to a report originally due
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *