1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 4275 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the application process and scoring for the low income |
---|
6 | 6 | | housing tax credit program. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 9 | | amended by adding Section 2306.6736 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 2306.6736. LOW INCOME HOUSING TAX CREDITS FINANCED |
---|
11 | 11 | | UNDER AMERICAN RECOVERY AND REINVESTMENT ACT OF 2009. (a) To the |
---|
12 | 12 | | extent the department receives federal funds under the American |
---|
13 | 13 | | Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Pub. L. No. 111-5) or any |
---|
14 | 14 | | subsequent law (including any extension or renewal thereof) that |
---|
15 | 15 | | requires the department to award the federal funds in the same |
---|
16 | 16 | | manner and subject to the same limitations as awards of housing tax |
---|
17 | 17 | | credits, the following provisions shall apply. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) Any reference in this chapter to the administration of |
---|
19 | 19 | | the housing tax credit program shall apply equally to the |
---|
20 | 20 | | administration of such federal funds, except: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (1) the department may establish a separate |
---|
22 | 22 | | application procedure for such funds, outside of the uniform |
---|
23 | 23 | | application cycle referred to in Section 2306.1111 and the |
---|
24 | 24 | | deadlines established in Section 2306.6724, and any reference |
---|
25 | 25 | | herein to the application period shall refer to the period |
---|
26 | 26 | | beginning on the date the department begins accepting applications |
---|
27 | 27 | | for such funds and continuing until all such available funds are |
---|
28 | 28 | | awarded; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) unless reauthorized, this section is repealed on |
---|
30 | 30 | | August 31, 2011. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
32 | 32 | | amended by adding Section 2306.6737 to read as follows: |
---|
33 | 33 | | Sec. 2306.6737. ASSISTANCE FROM AMERICAN RECOVERY AND |
---|
34 | 34 | | REINVESTMENT ACT OF 2009. If allowed by federal law, the department |
---|
35 | 35 | | shall, under any federally funded program resulting from the |
---|
36 | 36 | | American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Pub. L. No. 111-5), |
---|
37 | 37 | | secure the interests of the state through bonds, an ownership |
---|
38 | 38 | | interest in property, restrictive covenants filed in the real |
---|
39 | 39 | | property records, and/or liens filed on a property for which the |
---|
40 | 40 | | applicant has accepted funds until such a time as the department and |
---|
41 | 41 | | the State of Texas do not have liability to repay or recapture such |
---|
42 | 42 | | funds. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 3. It is the intent of the legislature that the |
---|
44 | 44 | | passage by the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, of another |
---|
45 | 45 | | bill that amends Chapter 2306, Government Code, and the amendments |
---|
46 | 46 | | made by this Act shall be harmonized, if possible, as provided by |
---|
47 | 47 | | Section 311.025(b), Government Code, so that effect may be given to |
---|
48 | 48 | | each. If the amendments made by this Act to Chapter 2306, |
---|
49 | 49 | | Government Code, and the amendments made to Chapter 2306, |
---|
50 | 50 | | Government Code, by any other bill are irreconcilable, it is the |
---|
51 | 51 | | intent of the legislature that this Act prevail, regardless of the |
---|
52 | 52 | | relative dates of enactment of this Act and the other bill or bills, |
---|
53 | 53 | | but only to the extent that any differences are irreconcilable. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act relating to |
---|
55 | 55 | | the evaluation of applications for financial assistance |
---|
56 | 56 | | administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
57 | 57 | | Affairs apply only to an application submitted on or after the |
---|
58 | 58 | | effective date of this Act. An application submitted before the |
---|
59 | 59 | | effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the |
---|
60 | 60 | | application was submitted, and the former law is continued in |
---|
61 | 61 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
63 | 63 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
64 | 64 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
65 | 65 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
66 | 66 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
67 | 67 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
68 | 68 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
69 | 69 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4275 was passed by the House on May 5, |
---|
70 | 70 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 4, 1 present, not |
---|
71 | 71 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
72 | 72 | | H.B. No. 4275 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
73 | 73 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
74 | 74 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
75 | 75 | | on H.B. No. 4275 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139, |
---|
76 | 76 | | Nays 6, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
77 | 77 | | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | 78 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
79 | 79 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4275 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
80 | 80 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
81 | 81 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
82 | 82 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
83 | 83 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
84 | 84 | | 4275 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
87 | 87 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
88 | 88 | | Date |
---|
89 | 89 | | __________________ |
---|
90 | 90 | | Governor |
---|