Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1948 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#454 | Journal Page: 2257 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2228 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2228 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 316 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 316 | |
House | 12/18/2008 | Filed |