E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5878
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5880
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1524
|
Journal Page: 5880
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5878
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5879
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2730
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2635
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2554
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2359
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#506
|
Journal Page: 2359
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2359
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Naishtat
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Amended
|
6-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|