Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#843
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|