Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4301 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R8450 EAH-D
 By: Legler H.B. No. 4301


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of certain county, municipal, and
 school district financial information on certain Internet
 websites.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 44, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE
 Sec. 44.101.  APPLICABILITY.  This subchapter applies only
 to a school district with 5,000 or more enrolled students.
 Sec. 44.102.  ELECTRONIC CHECKING ACCOUNT TRANSACTION
 REGISTER. (a) A school district shall maintain the transaction
 register for the district's checking account in a searchable
 electronic spreadsheet format, such as a portable document format
 (PDF) or similar file type, in which the transaction register is
 readily available for purposes of Subsections (e) and (f). Except
 as provided by Subsection (c) or (d), the electronic checking
 account transaction register must include for each check written
 from a district checking account:
 (1) the transaction amount;
 (2) the name of the payee; and
 (3) either:
 (A)  a statement of the purpose of the expenditure
 for which the check was written; or
 (B)  identification of the purpose of the
 expenditure, using the function code assigned to the expenditure
 for purposes of meeting state reporting requirements.
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), beginning September
 1, 2009, a school district's electronic checking account
 transaction register must contain the information required by
 Subsections (a)(1) and (2) for each check dated on or after August
 1, 2009. Beginning September 1, 2010, a district's electronic
 checking account transaction register must contain the information
 required by Subsections (a)(1) through (3) for each check dated on
 or after August 1, 2010.  This subsection expires October 1, 2010.
 (b)  If the school district complies with Subsection (a)(3)
 in the manner provided by Subsection (a)(3)(B), the district shall
 post on the district's Internet website:
 (1)  a description of each function code used for state
 reporting requirements; or
 (2)  a link to a page on the agency's Internet website
 that describes each function code used for state reporting
 requirements.
 (c)  A school district may not include in the district's
 electronic checking account transaction register a check issued to
 a district employee in payment of:
 (1) salary, wages, or an employment stipend; or
 (2)  a workers' compensation income benefit, medical
 benefit, death benefit, or burial benefit that is issued by a school
 district operating as a self-insurer under Chapter 504, Labor Code.
 (d)  This section does not apply to a checking account
 maintained by a school district or school campus solely for a
 student activity fund.
 (e)  A school district shall prominently post the electronic
 checking account transaction register at all times on the
 district's Internet website for viewing and downloading by
 interested persons.
 (f)  A school district shall share data from the electronic
 checking account transaction register with any interested person
 who requests the data.
 (g) A school district shall:
 (1)  update the electronic checking account
 transaction register at least once each month, not later than the
 30th day after the closing date of the most recent monthly statement
 for the checking account; and
 (2)  maintain each transaction or listing in the
 electronic checking account transaction register on the district's
 Internet website until the second anniversary of the date of the
 transaction or listing.
 Sec. 44.103.  POSTING OF DISTRICT FUND BALANCES.  (a)  A
 school district shall post on the district's Internet website a
 statement of the district's obligated and unobligated fund
 balances.
 (b) A school district shall:
 (1)  update the statement of fund balances at least
 once each month; and
 (2)  maintain each statement of fund balances on the
 district's Internet website until the second anniversary of the
 date of the statement.
 SECTION 2. Subtitle C, Title 4, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 134 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 134. FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE
 Sec. 134.001. APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies only to:
 (1)  a municipality with a population of 15,000 or
 more; and
 (2) a county with a population of 25,000 or more.
 Sec. 134.002.  ELECTRONIC CHECKING ACCOUNT TRANSACTION
 REGISTER. (a) The governing body of a municipality or
 commissioners court of a county shall maintain the transaction
 register for the municipality's or county's checking account in a
 searchable electronic spreadsheet format, such as a portable
 document format (PDF) or similar file type, in which the
 transaction register is readily available for purposes of
 Subsections (c) and (d). Except as provided by Subsection (b), the
 electronic checking account transaction register must include for
 each check written from a municipal or county checking account:
 (1) the transaction amount;
 (2) the name of the payee; and
 (3)  a statement of the purpose of the expenditure for
 which the check was written.
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), beginning September
 1, 2009, a municipality's or county's electronic checking account
 transaction register must contain the information required by
 Subsections (a)(1) and (2) for each check dated on or after August
 1, 2009. Beginning September 1, 2010, a municipality's or county's
 electronic checking account transaction register must contain the
 information required by Subsections (a)(1) through (3) for each
 check dated on or after August 1, 2010.  This subsection expires
 October 1, 2010.
 (b)  A municipality or county may not include in the
 municipality's or county's electronic checking account transaction
 register a check issued to a municipal or county employee in payment
 of:
 (1) salary, wages, or an employment stipend; or
 (2)  a workers' compensation income benefit, medical
 benefit, death benefit, or burial benefit that is issued by a school
 district operating as a self-insurer under Chapter 504, Labor Code.
 (c)  A municipality or county shall prominently post the
 electronic checking account transaction register at all times on
 the municipality's or county's Internet website for viewing and
 downloading by interested persons.
 (d)  A municipality or county shall share data from the
 electronic checking account transaction register with any
 interested person who requests the data.
 (e) A municipality or county shall:
 (1)  update the electronic checking account
 transaction register at least once each month, not later than the
 30th day after the closing date of the most recent monthly statement
 for the checking account; and
 (2)  maintain each transaction or listing in the
 electronic checking account transaction register on the
 municipality's or county's Internet website until the second
 anniversary of the date of the transaction or listing.
 Sec. 134.003.  POSTING OF MUNICIPAL AND COUNTY FUND
 BALANCES.  (a)  A municipality or county shall post on the
 municipality's or county's Internet website a statement of the
 municipality's or county's obligated and unobligated fund balances.
 (b) A municipality or county shall:
 (1)  update the statement of fund balances at least
 once each month; and
 (2)  maintain each statement of fund balances on the
 municipality's or county's Internet website until the second
 anniversary of the date of the statement.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.