Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6664
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1694
|
Journal Page: 6663
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6658
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2961
|
Journal Page: 6656
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4944
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4593
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4593
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5818
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5818
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5818
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5215
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#706
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Madden
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3021
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
12/18/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|