E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6540
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1673
|
Journal Page: 6539
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6534
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6901
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5019
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4927
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4594
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4594
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5912
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5912
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5912
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5203
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4058
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4058
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4058
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4058
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4058
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4058
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4058
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Harris
|
Journal Page: 4057
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#231
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
12/18/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|