House | 05/15/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3696 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1965 | Journal Page: 3696 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 906 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |