House | 05/11/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3102 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 727 | Journal Page: 3100 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 5/11/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2610 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2224 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Postponed | 5/1/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2032 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2032 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Postponed | 4/29/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2000 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 908 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 908 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |