1 | 1 | | By: Farias H.B. No. 4415 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of |
---|
7 | 7 | | higher education for certain military personnel and the spouses of |
---|
8 | 8 | | certain deceased and missing military personnel. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 54.203, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
11 | 11 | | amending Subsections (a), (b-1), (g), and (h) and adding Subsection |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a-1) and (k)to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (a) The governing board of each institution of higher |
---|
14 | 14 | | education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of |
---|
15 | 15 | | tuition, [all] dues, fees, and other required charges, including |
---|
16 | 16 | | fees for correspondence courses but excluding general deposit fees, |
---|
17 | 17 | | student services fees, and any fees or charges for lodging, board, |
---|
18 | 18 | | or clothing, provided the person [persons] seeking the exemption |
---|
19 | 19 | | [exemptions were citizens of Texas at the time they] entered the |
---|
20 | 20 | | service at a location in this state, declared this state as the |
---|
21 | 21 | | person's home of record in the manner provided by the applicable |
---|
22 | 22 | | military or other service, or would have been determined to be a |
---|
23 | 23 | | resident of this state for purposes of Subchapter B at the time the |
---|
24 | 24 | | person entered the service [services indicated and have resided in |
---|
25 | 25 | | Texas for at least the period of 12 months before the date of |
---|
26 | 26 | | registration]: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) all nurses and honorably discharged members of the |
---|
28 | 28 | | armed forces of the United States who served during the |
---|
29 | 29 | | Spanish-American War or during World War I; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2) all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary |
---|
31 | 31 | | Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency |
---|
32 | 32 | | Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces |
---|
33 | 33 | | of the United States who served during World War II except those who |
---|
34 | 34 | | were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or |
---|
35 | 35 | | because of a personal request on the part of the person that the |
---|
36 | 36 | | person [he] be discharged from service; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (3) all honorably discharged men and women of the |
---|
38 | 38 | | armed forces of the United States who served during the national |
---|
39 | 39 | | emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as |
---|
40 | 40 | | the Korean War; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (4) all persons who were honorably discharged from the |
---|
42 | 42 | | armed forces of the United States after serving on active military |
---|
43 | 43 | | duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a |
---|
44 | 44 | | portion of their active duty during: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (A) the Cold War which began on the date of the |
---|
46 | 46 | | termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3) [of |
---|
47 | 47 | | this subsection]; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (B) the Vietnam era which began on December 21, |
---|
49 | 49 | | 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (C) the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on |
---|
51 | 51 | | August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (D) the Panama era which began on December 20, |
---|
53 | 53 | | 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (E) the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2, |
---|
55 | 55 | | 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential |
---|
56 | 56 | | proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (F) the national emergency by reason of certain |
---|
58 | 58 | | terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or |
---|
59 | 59 | | (G) any future national emergency declared in |
---|
60 | 60 | | accordance with federal law. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (a-1) The exemptions provided for in Subsection (a) also |
---|
62 | 62 | | apply to the surviving spouse of: |
---|
63 | 63 | | (1) a member of the armed forces of the United States: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (A) who was killed in action; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (B) who died while in service; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (C) who is missing in action; or |
---|
67 | 67 | | (D) whose death is documented to be directly |
---|
68 | 68 | | caused by illness or injury connected with service in the armed |
---|
69 | 69 | | forces of the United States; or |
---|
70 | 70 | | (2) a member of the Texas National Guard or the Texas |
---|
71 | 71 | | Air National Guard who was killed since January 1, 1946, while on |
---|
72 | 72 | | active duty either in the service of this state or the United |
---|
73 | 73 | | States. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (b-1) To qualify for an exemption under Subsection (a-1) or |
---|
75 | 75 | | (b), the spouse or child [a person must be a citizen of Texas and] |
---|
76 | 76 | | must be classified as a resident under Subchapter B on [have resided |
---|
77 | 77 | | in the state for at least 12 months immediately preceding] the date |
---|
78 | 78 | | of the spouse's or child's [person's] registration. |
---|
79 | 79 | | (g) The governing board of a junior college district may |
---|
80 | 80 | | establish a fee for extraordinary costs associated with a specific |
---|
81 | 81 | | course or program and may provide that the exemptions provided by |
---|
82 | 82 | | this section [Subsections (a) and (b)] do not apply to this fee. |
---|
83 | 83 | | (h) The governing board of each institution of higher |
---|
84 | 84 | | education shall electronically report to the Texas Higher Education |
---|
85 | 85 | | Coordinating Board the information required by Section 61.0516 |
---|
86 | 86 | | relating to each individual receiving an exemption from fees and |
---|
87 | 87 | | charges under Subsection (a), (a-1), or (b). The institution shall |
---|
88 | 88 | | report the information not later than December 31 of each year for |
---|
89 | 89 | | the fall semester, May 31 of each year for the spring semester, and |
---|
90 | 90 | | September 30 of each year for the summer session. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (k) For purposes of this section, a person is the child of |
---|
92 | 92 | | another person if: |
---|
93 | 93 | | (1) the person is the stepchild or the biological or |
---|
94 | 94 | | adopted child of the other person; or |
---|
95 | 95 | | (2) the other person claimed the person as a dependent |
---|
96 | 96 | | on a federal income tax return filed for the preceding year or will |
---|
97 | 97 | | claim the person as a dependent on a federal income tax return for |
---|
98 | 98 | | the current year. |
---|
99 | 99 | | SECTION 2. Section 54.203, Education Code, as amended by |
---|
100 | 100 | | this Act, applies beginning with tuition and other fees charged for |
---|
101 | 101 | | the 2009 fall semester. Tuition and other fees charged for an |
---|
102 | 102 | | academic period before that semester are covered by the law in |
---|
103 | 103 | | effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the |
---|
104 | 104 | | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
105 | 105 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
106 | 106 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
107 | 107 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
108 | 108 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
109 | 109 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|