Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|