House | 05/15/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3697 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1774 | Journal Page: 3697 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 911 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 911 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |