Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3726
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|