Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4445 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 4445


 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and appointment of court interpreters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 57.002, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A licensed court interpreter appointed by a court
 under Subsection (a) or (b) must hold a license that includes the
 appropriate designation under Section 57.043(d) that indicates the
 interpreter is permitted to interpret in that court.
 SECTION 2. Section 57.043, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read
 as follows:
 (a) The executive director shall issue a court interpreter
 license to an applicant who:
 (1) can interpret for an individual who can hear but
 who does not comprehend English or communicate in English;
 (2) passes the appropriate examination prescribed by
 the executive director not earlier than two years before the date
 the executive director receives the applicant's application for a
 license; and
 (3) possesses the other qualifications for the license
 required by this subchapter or by rules adopted under this
 subchapter.
 (d)  A license issued under this subchapter must include at
 least one of the following designations:
 (1)  a basic designation that permits the interpreter
 to interpret court proceedings in justice courts and municipal
 courts that are not municipal courts of record, other than a
 proceeding before the court in which the judge is acting as a
 magistrate; or
 (2)  a master designation that permits the interpreter
 to interpret court proceedings in all courts in this state,
 including justice courts and municipal courts described by
 Subdivision (1).
 (e)  In adopting rules relating to licensing under this
 subchapter, the commission shall, after consulting with the board,
 prescribe the minimum score an individual must achieve on an
 examination to receive a license that includes a basic designation
 under Subsection (d) and the minimum score an individual must
 achieve to receive a license that includes a master designation
 under that subsection.
 SECTION 3. Section 57.046(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) The executive director shall prepare examinations under
 this subchapter that test an applicant's knowledge, skill, and
 efficiency in interpreting under this subchapter. The same
 examinations must be used for issuing a license that includes a
 basic designation or master designation as described by Section
 57.043(d).
 SECTION 4. (a) Notwithstanding Section 57.043(e),
 Government Code, as added by this Act, and not later than December
 1, 2011, the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation shall issue to a person who, on September
 1, 2011, holds a court interpreter license issued under Section
 57.043(a), Government Code, a new court interpreter license that
 includes a master designation described by Section 57.043(d)(2),
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) Section 57.043(d), Government Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a court interpreter license, other than a court
 interpreter license issued under Subsection (a) of this section,
 that is initially issued under Section 57.043(a), Government Code,
 on or after September 1, 2011, and to the subsequent renewal of that
 license.
 (c) Section 57.002(b-1), Government Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to the appointment of a licensed court
 interpreter on or after January 1, 2012. An appointment before that
 date is governed by the law in effect on the date the appointment
 was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4445 was passed by the House on May
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4445 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting; and that the House adopted S.C.R. No. 82
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 4445 on June 1, 2009, by
 the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4445 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; and that the Senate adopted S.C.R. No. 82 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 4445 on June 1, 2009 by the following
 vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor