1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 4445 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the licensing and appointment of court interpreters. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 57.002, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
8 | 8 | | adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | (b-1) A licensed court interpreter appointed by a court |
---|
10 | 10 | | under Subsection (a) or (b) must hold a license that includes the |
---|
11 | 11 | | appropriate designation under Section 57.043(d) that indicates the |
---|
12 | 12 | | interpreter is permitted to interpret in that court. |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 2. Section 57.043, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read |
---|
15 | 15 | | as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a) The executive director shall issue a court interpreter |
---|
17 | 17 | | license to an applicant who: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) can interpret for an individual who can hear but |
---|
19 | 19 | | who does not comprehend English or communicate in English; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (2) passes the appropriate examination prescribed by |
---|
21 | 21 | | the executive director not earlier than two years before the date |
---|
22 | 22 | | the executive director receives the applicant's application for a |
---|
23 | 23 | | license; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) possesses the other qualifications for the license |
---|
25 | 25 | | required by this subchapter or by rules adopted under this |
---|
26 | 26 | | subchapter. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (d) A license issued under this subchapter must include at |
---|
28 | 28 | | least one of the following designations: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) a basic designation that permits the interpreter |
---|
30 | 30 | | to interpret court proceedings in justice courts and municipal |
---|
31 | 31 | | courts that are not municipal courts of record, other than a |
---|
32 | 32 | | proceeding before the court in which the judge is acting as a |
---|
33 | 33 | | magistrate; or |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) a master designation that permits the interpreter |
---|
35 | 35 | | to interpret court proceedings in all courts in this state, |
---|
36 | 36 | | including justice courts and municipal courts described by |
---|
37 | 37 | | Subdivision (1). |
---|
38 | 38 | | (e) In adopting rules relating to licensing under this |
---|
39 | 39 | | subchapter, the commission shall, after consulting with the board, |
---|
40 | 40 | | prescribe the minimum score an individual must achieve on an |
---|
41 | 41 | | examination to receive a license that includes a basic designation |
---|
42 | 42 | | under Subsection (d) and the minimum score an individual must |
---|
43 | 43 | | achieve to receive a license that includes a master designation |
---|
44 | 44 | | under that subsection. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 3. Section 57.046(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
46 | 46 | | to read as follows: |
---|
47 | 47 | | (a) The executive director shall prepare examinations under |
---|
48 | 48 | | this subchapter that test an applicant's knowledge, skill, and |
---|
49 | 49 | | efficiency in interpreting under this subchapter. The same |
---|
50 | 50 | | examinations must be used for issuing a license that includes a |
---|
51 | 51 | | basic designation or master designation as described by Section |
---|
52 | 52 | | 57.043(d). |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 4. (a) Notwithstanding Section 57.043(e), |
---|
54 | 54 | | Government Code, as added by this Act, and not later than December |
---|
55 | 55 | | 1, 2011, the executive director of the Texas Department of |
---|
56 | 56 | | Licensing and Regulation shall issue to a person who, on September |
---|
57 | 57 | | 1, 2011, holds a court interpreter license issued under Section |
---|
58 | 58 | | 57.043(a), Government Code, a new court interpreter license that |
---|
59 | 59 | | includes a master designation described by Section 57.043(d)(2), |
---|
60 | 60 | | Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (b) Section 57.043(d), Government Code, as added by this |
---|
62 | 62 | | Act, applies only to a court interpreter license, other than a court |
---|
63 | 63 | | interpreter license issued under Subsection (a) of this section, |
---|
64 | 64 | | that is initially issued under Section 57.043(a), Government Code, |
---|
65 | 65 | | on or after September 1, 2011, and to the subsequent renewal of that |
---|
66 | 66 | | license. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (c) Section 57.002(b-1), Government Code, as added by this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act, applies only to the appointment of a licensed court |
---|
69 | 69 | | interpreter on or after January 1, 2012. An appointment before that |
---|
70 | 70 | | date is governed by the law in effect on the date the appointment |
---|
71 | 71 | | was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that |
---|
72 | 72 | | purpose. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
74 | 74 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
75 | 75 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
76 | 76 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4445 was passed by the House on May |
---|
77 | 77 | | 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
78 | 78 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
79 | 79 | | No. 4445 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0, |
---|
80 | 80 | | 2 present, not voting; and that the House adopted S.C.R. No. 82 |
---|
81 | 81 | | authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 4445 on June 1, 2009, by |
---|
82 | 82 | | the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
83 | 83 | | ______________________________ |
---|
84 | 84 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
85 | 85 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4445 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
86 | 86 | | amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
87 | 87 | | 0; and that the Senate adopted S.C.R. No. 82 authorizing certain |
---|
88 | 88 | | corrections in H.B. No. 4445 on June 1, 2009 by the following |
---|
89 | 89 | | vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
90 | 90 | | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
92 | 92 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
93 | 93 | | Date |
---|
94 | 94 | | __________________ |
---|
95 | 95 | | Governor |
---|