Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4458 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Strama H.B. No. 4458


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to research development and deployment of emerging
 technology in the area of electricity storage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  As a component of an electric utility's
 market-transformation programs, including programs targeted to the
 construction of new buildings, each utility shall provide
 incentives for the development and use of the following distributed
 energy storage technologies:
 (1) capacitors;
 (2) batteries;
 (3) ice-based thermal storage; and
 (4) molten salt-based storage.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 39.923 and 39.924 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.923.  NET METERING AND FAIR MARKET COMPENSATION OF
 ON-SITE ENERGY PRODUCTION.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Net metering service" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 111(d)(11) of the federal Public Utility Regulatory
 Policies Act of 1978 (16 U.S.C. Section 2621(d)(11)).
 (2)  "Renewable energy technology" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 39.904(d).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission by rule
 shall require an electric utility to:
 (1)  offer net metering service to all retail customers
 of the utility who have an eligible on-site:
 (A)  distributed energy generating facility that
 generates electricity using renewable energy technology; or
 (B) distributed energy storage facility; and
 (2)  compensate a retail customer at fair market value
 for metered electricity:
 (A)  produced by the customer's eligible on-site
 renewable energy technology generating facility and delivered to
 the electric transmission grid; or
 (B)  delivered to the electric transmission grid
 from an eligible on-site distributed energy storage facility.
 (c)  The commission by rule may establish standards an
 on-site renewable energy technology generating facility or on-site
 distributed energy storage facility must meet to be eligible for
 compensation under Subsection (b), including standards for
 equipment and for interconnection.
 Sec. 39.924.  VEHICLE-BASED BATTERY STORAGE.  The commission
 by rule shall require each electric utility to integrate into at
 least 20 percent of the utility's net metering infrastructure by
 not later than January 1, 2020, the ability to measure and deliver
 to the electric transmission grid electricity from vehicle-based
 battery storage.
 SECTION 3. Chapter 388, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 388.0035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 388.0035.  REQUIREMENTS RELATING TO COMPATIBILITY WITH
 PLUG-IN MOTOR VEHICLES.  The State Energy Conservation Office by
 rule shall amend the energy code for single-family residential
 construction to require that new homes built after 2012 have an
 electrical system, including outlets, that is capable of recharging
 plug-in electric or plug-in hybrid electric motor vehicles.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 37, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.0525 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0525.  EXCEPTION TO CERTIFICATE FOR DEPLOYMENT OF
 STORAGE CAPACITY.  A transmission and distribution utility is not
 required to obtain a certificate for deploying not more than five
 megawatts of stored renewable energy for grid stability and
 transmission congestion management.
 SECTION 5. Subchapter C, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.1055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.1055.  OWNERSHIP AND SALE OF STORED RENEWABLE
 ENERGY.  (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission by rule
 shall allow a transmission and distribution utility to own and sell
 stored renewable energy.
 (b)  In adopting rules under this section, the commission
 shall limit the amount of stored renewable energy a transmission
 and distribution utility may own and sell to an amount that will not
 affect market prices.
 SECTION 6. (a) The Electric Reliability Council of Texas
 shall conduct a study of the best methods to deploy utility-scale
 distributed renewable stored energy on the transmission and
 distribution grid in a manner that minimizes costs to consumers.
 (b) Not later than January 1, 2011, the Electric Reliability
 Council of Texas shall prepare a report on the study and submit the
 report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and each house and senate standing
 committee that has jurisdiction over electric issues. The report
 must include recommendations for policy or statutory changes
 necessary to implement the results of the study.
 SECTION 7. ENERGY STORAGE RESEARCH, DEVELOPMENT,
 DEMONSTRATION, AND COMMERCIALIZATION. Section 447.006(e) of the
 Government Code is amended by adding Subsection (j) as follows:
 (j)  The state energy conservation office shall develop a
 program to encourage the development of advanced energy storage
 technologies in this state:
 (1)  The office shall seek federal funds available
 under the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 including
 grants for the manufacturing of advanced batteries and components,
 funding awards to manufacturers of advanced battery systems and
 vehicle batteries, and funds available to support smart grid
 demonstration projects in urban, suburban, tribal, and rural areas,
 including areas where electric system assets are controlled by
 nonprofit entities and areas where electric system assets are
 controlled by investor-owned utilities
 (2) The office shall contract with an institution of
 higher education, a consortium of institutions of higher education,
 or another governmental entity to develop, test and commercialize
 new storage and reliability technologies for renewable energy to
 minimize costs of generation and transmission using federal or
 state funds or fee revenue.
 (3)  The office shall by 2011 perform a study in
 conjunction with ERCOT to determine:
 a. how to deploy storage to minimize consumer costs
 b.  how to use storage to meet to maximize opportunities to
 sell Texas renewable energy out of state to meet any new federal
 renewable portfolio standard requirements
 c.  the impact of plug in hybrid and electric vehicle demand
 on the transmission systems and develop integration and utilization
 systems.
 d.  how to encourage the development, construction, and
 operation of new renewable energy storage projects at those sites
 in this state that have the greatest economic potential for capture
 and release of energy from development of this state's
 environmentally beneficial renewable resources.
 (4)  The office shall contract with a consortium of
 community colleges to create training and certification programs to
 support energy storage technologies.
 SECTION 8. The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 adopt rules as required by this Act as soon as possible, but not
 later than January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.