House | 05/07/2009 | Postponed | 6/2/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2718 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2718 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Postponed | 5/7/09 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2157 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1871 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 915 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 915 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |