House | 04/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 915 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 915 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |