Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB448 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hopson (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 448
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 30, 2009;
 April 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 5, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 5, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 448 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the Department of State Health Services to
 implement a provider choice system for certain vaccines.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 161, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 161.01035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.01035.  PROVIDER CHOICE SYSTEM.  (a)  The
 department shall implement a provider choice system for the
 vaccines for children program operated by the department under
 authority of 42 U.S.C. Section 1396s and the adult safety net
 vaccination program.
 (b)  The department shall ensure that eligible health care
 providers participating in the vaccines for children program or the
 adult safety net vaccination program may select any licensed
 vaccine, including combination vaccines and any dosage forms that:
 (1)  are recommended by the federal Advisory Committee
 on Immunization Practices;
 (2)  are made available to the department by the
 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States
 Public Health Service; and
 (3)  for adult vaccines, are on the department-approved
 list of vaccines offered by the adult safety net vaccination
 program.
 (c)  For the purposes of this section, "equivalent vaccines"
 means two or more vaccines, excluding the influenza vaccine, that
 meet all of the following:
 (1)  protect a recipient of a vaccine against the same
 infection or infections;
 (2) require the same number of doses;
 (3) have similar safety and efficacy profiles; and
 (4)  are recommended for comparable populations by the
 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States
 Public Health Service.
 (d)  The department shall provide a vaccine selected by a
 health care provider under Subsection (b) only if the cost to the
 department of providing the vaccine is not more than 115 percent of
 the lowest-priced equivalent vaccine.
 (e)  This section does not apply in the event of a disaster or
 public health emergency, terrorist attack, hostile military or
 paramilitary action, or extraordinary law enforcement emergency.
 (f)  The department shall convene the immunization work
 group established under Section 161.0095 and solicit its
 recommendations regarding development of a plan for the
 implementation of the provider choice system under this section.
 The plan shall include the education of participating health care
 providers about:
 (1)  procedures and distribution systems of the Centers
 for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States Public
 Health Service; and
 (2)  vaccine options, the enrollment process,
 ordering, accountability, and reporting procedures.
 SECTION 2. Effective September 1, 2010, Section 161.0103,
 Health and Safety Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3. The Department of State Health Services shall
 implement all or part of the provider choice system under Section
 161.01035, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, as soon as
 it is determined to be feasible, provided, however, that the
 department shall complete implementation of the system not later
 than August 31, 2010.
 SECTION 4. Except as provided by this Act, this Act takes
 effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *