1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 448 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to requiring the Department of State Health Services to |
---|
6 | 6 | | implement a provider choice system for certain vaccines. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 161, Health and Safety |
---|
9 | 9 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 161.01035 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 161.01035. PROVIDER CHOICE SYSTEM. (a) The |
---|
11 | 11 | | department shall implement a provider choice system for the |
---|
12 | 12 | | vaccines for children program operated by the department under |
---|
13 | 13 | | authority of 42 U.S.C. Section 1396s and the adult safety net |
---|
14 | 14 | | vaccination program. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b) The department shall ensure that eligible health care |
---|
16 | 16 | | providers participating in the vaccines for children program or the |
---|
17 | 17 | | adult safety net vaccination program may select any licensed |
---|
18 | 18 | | vaccine, including combination vaccines and any dosage forms that: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) are recommended by the federal Advisory Committee |
---|
20 | 20 | | on Immunization Practices; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) are made available to the department by the |
---|
22 | 22 | | Centers for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States |
---|
23 | 23 | | Public Health Service; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) for adult vaccines, are on the department-approved |
---|
25 | 25 | | list of vaccines offered by the adult safety net vaccination |
---|
26 | 26 | | program. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (c) For the purposes of this section, "equivalent vaccines" |
---|
28 | 28 | | means two or more vaccines, excluding the influenza vaccine, that |
---|
29 | 29 | | meet all of the following: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) protect a recipient of a vaccine against the same |
---|
31 | 31 | | infection or infections; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) require the same number of doses; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (3) have similar safety and efficacy profiles; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (4) are recommended for comparable populations by the |
---|
35 | 35 | | Centers for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States |
---|
36 | 36 | | Public Health Service. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) The department shall provide a vaccine selected by a |
---|
38 | 38 | | health care provider under Subsection (b) only if the cost to the |
---|
39 | 39 | | department of providing the vaccine is not more than 115 percent of |
---|
40 | 40 | | the lowest-priced equivalent vaccine. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (e) This section does not apply in the event of a disaster or |
---|
42 | 42 | | public health emergency, terrorist attack, hostile military or |
---|
43 | 43 | | paramilitary action, or extraordinary law enforcement emergency. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (f) The department shall convene the immunization work |
---|
45 | 45 | | group established under Section 161.0095 and solicit its |
---|
46 | 46 | | recommendations regarding development of a plan for the |
---|
47 | 47 | | implementation of the provider choice system under this section. |
---|
48 | 48 | | The plan shall include the education of participating health care |
---|
49 | 49 | | providers about: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) procedures and distribution systems of the Centers |
---|
51 | 51 | | for Disease Control and Prevention of the United States Public |
---|
52 | 52 | | Health Service; and |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) vaccine options, the enrollment process, |
---|
54 | 54 | | ordering, accountability, and reporting procedures. |
---|
55 | 55 | | SECTION 2. Effective September 1, 2010, Section 161.0103, |
---|
56 | 56 | | Health and Safety Code, is repealed. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 3. The Department of State Health Services shall |
---|
58 | 58 | | implement all or part of the provider choice system under Section |
---|
59 | 59 | | 161.01035, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, as soon as |
---|
60 | 60 | | it is determined to be feasible, provided, however, that the |
---|
61 | 61 | | department shall complete implementation of the system not later |
---|
62 | 62 | | than August 31, 2010. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 4. Except as provided by this Act, this Act takes |
---|
64 | 64 | | effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
65 | 65 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
66 | 66 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
67 | 67 | | I certify that H.B. No. 448 was passed by the House on March |
---|
68 | 68 | | 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
69 | 69 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
70 | 70 | | No. 448 on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 |
---|
71 | 71 | | present, not voting. |
---|
72 | 72 | | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | 73 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
74 | 74 | | I certify that H.B. No. 448 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
75 | 75 | | amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
76 | 76 | | 0. |
---|
77 | 77 | | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | 78 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
79 | 79 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | Date |
---|
81 | 81 | | __________________ |
---|
82 | 82 | | Governor |
---|