E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2893
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4478
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1083
|
Journal Page: 4478
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4478
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4302
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#314
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Laubenberg
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 317
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 317
|
House
|
12/19/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|