Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4502 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Coleman H.B. No. 4502


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to charity care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 311.031(2) and (16), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (2) "Charity care" means the unreimbursed cost, not
 including bad debt expense, to a hospital of:
 (A) providing, funding, or otherwise financially
 supporting health care services on an inpatient or outpatient basis
 to a person classified by the hospital as "financially indigent" or
 "medically indigent"; and/or
 (B) providing, funding, or otherwise financially
 supporting health care services provided to financially indigent
 persons through other nonprofit or public outpatient clinics,
 hospitals, or health care organizations.
 (16) "Unreimbursed costs" means the costs a hospital
 incurs for providing services after subtracting payments received
 from any source for such services including but not limited to the
 following: third-party insurance payments; Medicare payments;
 Medicaid payments; Medicare education reimbursements; state
 reimbursements for education; payments from drug companies to
 pursue research; grant funds for research; and disproportionate
 share payments. For purposes of this definition, the term "costs"
 shall be calculated by applying the hospital's Medicare cost ratio
 [to charge ratios derived in accordance with generally accepted
 accounting principles for hospitals] to billed charges. The
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 by rule may supplement the Medicare cost ratio with additional
 expenses and revenues that are reasonable and medically necessary
 and subject to third-party insurer reimbursement. The calculation
 of the cost to charge ratios shall be based on the most recently
 completed and audited prior fiscal year of the hospital or hospital
 system. Prior to January 1, 1996, for purposes of this definition,
 charitable contributions and grants to a hospital, including
 transfers from endowment or other funds controlled by the hospital
 or its nonprofit supporting entities, shall not be subtracted from
 the costs of providing services for purposes of determining
 unreimbursed costs. After January 1, 1996, for purposes of this
 definition, charitable contributions and grants to a hospital,
 including transfers from endowment or other funds controlled by the
 hospital or its nonprofit supporting entities, shall not be
 subtracted from the costs of providing services for purposes of
 determining the unreimbursed costs of charity care and
 government-sponsored indigent health care.
 SECTION 2. Amend Texas Government Code, Chapter 531 to add a
 new Subchapter Q to read as follows:
 Subchapter Q. Study on Hospital Billing and Collection Practices
 Sec. 531.701.  Study concerning hospital billing and
 collection practices.
 (a)  The Texas Health and Human Services Commission shall study
 the effects of hospital and billing practices on the uninsured and
 underinsured.
 (b)  By the use of a hospital questionnaire and such other
 investigative tools including sample hospital audits, interviews,
 public hearings and reports, the study shall address:
 (i)  the effects of hospital billing, including pricing and
 discounting. practices by public health region as designated under
 Texas Health & Safety Code, Section 121.007 upon the uninsured, the
 underinsured, insurers, governmental payors, and other third-party
 payors;
 (ii)  The effects of hospital billing, including pricing and
 discounting, and collection practices upon the uninsured and
 underinsured including any barriers to health care access and
 economic consequences; and
 (iii)  The actions other jurisdictions have taken through
 legislation or litigation to address hospital billing and
 collection practices upon the uninsured and the underinsured.
 (c)  Any data presented in the study shall be indexed by hospital
 organizational structure: for profit, nonprofit, and public.
 (d)  The study shall commence no later than November 15, 2009 and
 produce a report on the study to be filed with the legislature no
 later than December 15, 2010. At that date, the commission shall
 publish the report on its website in a conspicuous location.
 (e)  The performance of the study may be delegated by the
 commission to one or more working groups that may include public
 members and representatives from the Texas Attorney General, Texas
 Comptroller of Public Accounts and the Texas Department of State
 Health Services.  At least half of the public members appointed to
 any working group must be individuals or representatives of
 organizations that advocate on behalf of consumers on health care
 issues.
 (f)  Public hearings shall be held throughout the state to receive
 public testimony for inclusion in the report.  At the commission's
 request, a working group member may coordinate, convene, and
 preside at a public hearing.  Among other resources, the commission
 may rely on donations of space, equipment, and personnel for the
 public hearing.
 (g)  The commission or its delegate may retain public accountants
 and such other experts considered reasonably necessary to perform
 the study and may seek collaboration from the Texas Attorney
 General, the Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts and the Texas
 Department of State Health Services.
 Sec. 531.702.  Expiration of Subchaper. This Subchapter
 expires on January 31, 2011.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter D, Chapter 311, Health and Safety
 Code is amended by adding Section 311.0471 to read as follows:
 Sec. 311.0471.  INVESTIGATION AND ENFORCEMENT.  (a)  Except
 as otherwise provided, this section applies only to a hospital, as
 that term is defined by Section 311.031.
 (b)  The attorney general shall investigate whether a
 hospital has violated this Subchapter on receipt of a public
 complaint.
 (c)  The attorney general may conduct any investigation
 considered necessary regarding possible violations of this
 Subchapter by a hospital, including:
 (1) examination of the hospital's premises;
 (2)  on written request to the chief operating officer
 of the hospital, examination of any record, book, document,
 account, or paper necessary to investigate the alleged violation;
 (3)  requiring the hospital to file a statement or
 report or answer interrogatories in writing relating to all
 information relevant to the alleged violations; and
 (4)  subpoena examination under oath of any person who
 possesses knowledge or information directly related to the alleged
 violations.
 (d)  If the attorney general has reason to believe that a
 hospital has violated this Subchapter, the attorney general may
 bring action on behalf of the state against the hospital to obtain
 temporary, preliminary, or permanent injunctive relief for any act,
 policy, or practice by the hospital that violates this Subchapter.
 Before bringing an action, the attorney general may permit the
 hospital to submit a correction plan for the attorney general's
 approval.
 (e)  The attorney general may seek a civil monetary penalty
 not to exceed $1,000 per violation per day if a hospital, by pattern
 or practice, knowingly violates this Subchapter.
 (f)  In an action filed under this Subchapter, the attorney
 general may seek the recovery of court costs and legal fees.
 (g)  If a court grants a final order of relief against a
 nonprofit hospital for a violation of this Subchapter, the
 attorney general shall notify each taxing authority that has
 granted the nonprofit hospital a tax exemption about the court's
 decision.
 (h)  The attorney general shall establish a complaint
 process through which the public may file complaints involving
 violations of this Subchapter.  The complaint process at a minimum
 must include:
 (1)  a mail address, a toll-free telephone number, and
 an e-mail address for receiving complaints;
 (2)  a public education campaign concerning the
 obligations hospitals have to the public under this Subchapter;
 (3)  a public education campaign concerning the
 attorney general's complaint process; and
 (4)  complaint forms and instructions to aid the public
 in making complaints.
 (i)  The attorney general shall prepare and publicly
 distribute, including posting in a conspicuous location on the
 attorney general's website, an annual report that informs the
 public of the attorney general's activities under this Subchapter
 for the previous year.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.