Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB451 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 451


 AN ACT
 relating to health benefit plan coverage for autism spectrum
 disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1355.002, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1355.002. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
 subchapter applies only to a group health benefit plan that
 provides benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a
 result of a health condition, accident, or sickness, including:
 (1) a group insurance policy, group insurance
 agreement, group hospital service contract, or group evidence of
 coverage that is offered by:
 (A) an insurance company;
 (B) a group hospital service corporation
 operating under Chapter 842;
 (C) a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (D) a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884; or
 (E) a health maintenance organization operating
 under Chapter 843; and
 (2) to the extent permitted by the Employee Retirement
 Income Security Act of 1974 (29 U.S.C. Section 1001 et seq.), a plan
 offered under:
 (A) a multiple employer welfare arrangement as
 defined by Section 3 of that Act; or
 (B) another analogous benefit arrangement.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1575 or 1579 or
 any other law, Section 1355.015 applies to:
 (1) a basic plan under Chapter 1575; and
 (2) a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579.
 SECTION 2. Section 1355.015(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) At a minimum, a health benefit plan must provide
 coverage as provided by this section to an enrollee [older than two
 years of age and younger than six years of age] who is diagnosed
 with autism spectrum disorder from the date of diagnosis until the
 enrollee completes nine years of age. If an enrollee who is being
 treated for autism spectrum disorder becomes 10 [six] years of age
 or older and continues to need treatment, this subsection does not
 preclude coverage of treatment and services described by Subsection
 (b).
 SECTION 3. This Act applies only to a health benefit plan
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1,
 2010. A health benefit plan delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed before January 1, 2010, is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 451 was passed by the House on May 15,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 451 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 451 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 122,
 Nays 20, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 451 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 451 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor