Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#629
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#615
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/6/09 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2535
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2535
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce
|
|
Journal Page: 946
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 946
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|