House | 05/12/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3301 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1118 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 947 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 947 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |