Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4541 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 4541


 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas
 Department of Public Safety to Webb County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) Not later than May 1, 2010, the Texas
 Department of Public Safety shall transfer to Webb County the real
 property described by Section 3 of this Act.
 (b) Webb County shall use the property transferred under
 this Act only for a purpose that benefits the public interest of the
 state. If Webb County uses the property for any purpose other than
 a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state, ownership
 of the property automatically reverts to the Texas Department of
 Public Safety.
 (c) The Texas Department of Public Safety shall transfer the
 property by an appropriate instrument of transfer. The instrument
 of transfer must:
 (1) provide that:
 (A) Webb County use the property only for a
 purpose that benefits the public interest of the state; and
 (B) ownership of the property will automatically
 revert to the Texas Department of Public Safety if Webb County uses
 the property for any purpose other than a purpose that benefits the
 public interest of the state; and
 (2) describe the property to be transferred by metes
 and bounds.
 (d) The Texas Department of Public Safety shall retain
 custody of the instrument of transfer after the instrument of
 transfer is filed in the real property records of Webb County.
 (e) Webb County shall pay any transaction fees resulting
 from the transfer of property under this Act.
 SECTION 2. Before the transfer of the real property
 authorized by Section 1 of this Act, Webb County shall obtain, at
 Webb County's expense, a survey of the metes and bounds description
 for the transfer instrument.
 SECTION 3. The real property referred to in Section 1 of
 this Act is described as follows:
 TRACT I:
 A tract of land in Webb County, Texas, containing 1.4733
 acres, more or less, out of Leonardo Sanchez Porcion 23, Abstract
 283, being out of a 72.4428 acre tract conveyed to J.C. Martin, III,
 et al, by Abe Calamusa, Individually and for the Estate of Elizabeth
 Borrello Baccaro, Deceased, et al, by Deed dated January 29, 1972,
 recorded in Volume 416, Pages 493-98 of the Deed Records of Webb
 County, Texas; this 1.4733 acre tract being more particularly
 described as follows, to-wit:
 Commencing (for a connection) at a fence corner on the east
 right-of-way line of Interstate Highway No. 35 at its intersection
 with the south line of the original Baccaro Tract and north line of
 the Ortiz Tract, said fence corner being the westerly southwest
 corner of said 72.4428 acre tract;
 THENCE N. 1858'29" E. 366.90 feet with the east right-of-way line
 of Interstate Highway 35 to a point which bears S 7653'15" E. 0.27
 feet from the center of a steel fence post, the northwest corner of
 a 5.0 acre tract as fenced, and the southwest and beginning corner
 of this tract;
 THENCE N. 1858'29" E. 190.67 feet with the east right-of-way of
 Interstate Highway 35 to a 1/2" steel rod, the westerly southwest
 corner of a 3.5000 acre tract and the northwest corner of this
 tract;
 THENCE S. 7110'47" E. 372.87 feet with the south line of said 3.5000
 acre tract a 1/2" steel rod, an interior corner of said 3.5000 acre
 tract and the northeast corner of this tract;
 THENCE S. 1849'13" W. 153.66 feet with lower west line of said
 3.5000 acre tract to a 1/2" steel rod on the north line of said 5.0
 acre tract, the southerly southwest corner of said 3.5000 acre
 tract and the southeast corner of this tract;
 THENCE N. 7610'47"W. 25.6 feet to a steel fence corner post of a
 chain link fence on the occupied north line of said 5.0 acre tract
 and a deflection corner of this tract;
 THENCE N. 7653'15"W. 349.62 feet with chain link fence on the
 occupied north line of said 5.0 acre tract to the place of
 beginning.
 TRACT II:
 A strip of land along and adjacent to the west boundary line
 of Tract I approximately 200 feet in width, which tract is bounded
 on its south side by an extension of the south boundary line of
 Tract I southwesterly along the same course as the south boundary
 line of Tract I from the southwest corner of Tract I to a point on
 the original west boundary line of that certain tract known as the
 Nick Baccaro Tract, which is also the west line of that certain
 right-of-way easement under instrument executed by Elizabeth B.
 Baccaro on September 5, 1958, to the State of Texas of record in
 Vol. 264, Pages 138-139, of the Deed Records of Webb County, Texas;
 and is bounded on the east side by the west boundary line of Tract I;
 and is bounded on the north side by an extension of a line parallel
 with the north boundary line of Tract I hereinabove described, but
 which commences at the northwest corner of Tract I and extends from
 said point in a northwesterly direction, being N. 7110'47"W. to its
 junction with the original west boundary line of said Nick Baccaro
 Tract, also the west boundary line of said right-of-way easement to
 the State of Texas hereinabove referred to; and is bounded on its
 west side by the original west boundary of said Nick Baccaro Tract
 and the west line of said right-of-way easement to the State of
 Texas extending from its junction with the south boundary line
 hereof and the north boundary line hereof; subject, however, to all
 rights of the State of Texas and its successors and assigns under
 right-of-way easement dated September 5, 1958, and recorded in Vol.
 264, Pages 138-139, of the Deed Records of Webb County, Texas.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4541 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4541 was passed by the Senate on May
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor