Senate | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2508 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2198 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Record vote | RV#695 | Journal Page: 3025 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Postponed | Journal Page: 2993 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2993 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2737 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2737 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2737 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 317 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 317 | |
House | 12/22/2008 | Filed |