E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4314 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2660 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Point of order | Journal Page: 2659 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Shapleigh | Journal Page: 2657 |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2657 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2657 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#365 | Journal Page: 1975 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1975 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1975 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Amended | 1-Chisum | Journal Page: 1909 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 950 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 950 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |