E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR291
|
Journal Page: 6943
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1656
|
Journal Page: 6467
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6901
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5003
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4905
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5559
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5559
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5559
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA3 Watson
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 3914
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3914
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3914
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3733
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#880
|
Journal Page: 3732
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3732
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 3732
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3732
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3534
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Creighton
|
Journal Page: 3534
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3533
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 950
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 950
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|