E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/09/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5562
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 5562
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1459
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3536
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 3525
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3524
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/27/09 11:15 AM
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1146
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#168
|
Journal Page: 1279
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1279
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Amended
|
1-W. Smith, Hamilton, and Eiland
|
Journal Page: 1279
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1279
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#166
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
19-Dunnam
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
20-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
19-Dunnam
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amended
|
15-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
16-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1254
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
4-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
12-W. Smith
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1250
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
5-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#141
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|