Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 5041
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1721
|
Journal Page: 6876
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4590
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4589
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5819
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5819
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5819
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3056
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#657
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Leibowitz
|
Journal Page: 2750
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2750
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2707
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Harless
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 317
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 317
|
House
|
12/22/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|