Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4594 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eiland (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 4594
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 23, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to permits for the movement of oversize and overweight
 vehicles in a certain county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 623.252(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A permit issued under this subchapter may authorize:
 (1) the transport of cargo only on the following roads
 in Chambers County:
 (A) Farm-to-Market Road 1405 between its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 2354 and its intersection
 with Farm-to-Market Road 565; [and]
 (B) the frontage road of State Highway 99 located
 in the Cedar Crossing Business Park;
 (C)  Farm-to-Market Road 565 from its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 1405 east approximately
 6,200 linear feet to the western edge of the 10-foot pipeline
 easement recorded at volume 351, page 760, of the Chambers County
 deed records; and
 (D)  Farm-to-Market Road 2354 from its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 1405 northwest approximately
 300 linear feet to the termination of the state-maintained portion
 of the road; and
 (2) the movement of equipment and commodities weighing
 100,000 pounds or less.
 SECTION 2. Section 623.255(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) A permit issued under this subchapter must include:
 (1) the name of the applicant;
 (2) the date of issuance;
 (3) the signature of the designated agent for the
 county;
 (4) a statement of the kind of cargo being
 transported, the maximum weight and dimensions of the equipment,
 and the kind and weight of each commodity to be transported;
 (5) a statement of any condition on which the permit is
 issued;
 (6) a statement that the cargo may be transported in
 Chambers County only over the roads described by Section
 623.252(b)(1) [Farm-to-Market Road 1405 and the frontage road of
 State Highway 99 located in the Cedar Crossing Business Park]; and
 (7) the location where the cargo was loaded.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *