1 | 1 | | By: Oliveira H.B. No. 4612 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to annexation by and disannexation from certain |
---|
7 | 7 | | municipalities. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 43, Local Government Code, |
---|
10 | 10 | | is amended by adding Section 43.0547 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 43.0547. COMPACTNESS REQUIREMENT FOR ANNEXATION IN |
---|
12 | 12 | | CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a |
---|
13 | 13 | | municipality in a county that contains an international border and |
---|
14 | 14 | | borders the Gulf of Mexico may not annex an area unless: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) the area is compact; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) the addition of the area to the municipality |
---|
17 | 17 | | serves the goal of creating a single compact municipal area. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) For purposes of this section, the area to be annexed is |
---|
19 | 19 | | compact if it is concentrated in a single area. The addition of an |
---|
20 | 20 | | area to a municipality serves the goal of creating a single compact |
---|
21 | 21 | | municipal area if the action does not create enclaves, pockets, or |
---|
22 | 22 | | finger areas. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 43, Local Government Code, |
---|
24 | 24 | | is amended by adding Section 43.058 to read as follows: |
---|
25 | 25 | | Sec. 43.058. PROHIBITION AGAINST ANNEXATION TO SURROUND |
---|
26 | 26 | | MUNICIPALITY IN CERTAIN COUNTIES. A municipality in a county that |
---|
27 | 27 | | contains an international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico may |
---|
28 | 28 | | not annex an area if the annexation or the resulting expansion of |
---|
29 | 29 | | the annexing municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction will |
---|
30 | 30 | | cause another municipality to be entirely surrounded by the |
---|
31 | 31 | | annexing municipality or the extraterritorial jurisdiction of the |
---|
32 | 32 | | annexing municipality. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter Z, Chapter 43, Local Government Code, |
---|
34 | 34 | | is amended by adding Section 43.908 to read as follows: |
---|
35 | 35 | | Sec. 43.908. REQUIRED ANNEXATION BY AND DISANNEXATION FROM |
---|
36 | 36 | | CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) A municipality in a county that |
---|
37 | 37 | | contains an international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico |
---|
38 | 38 | | shall: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) not later than December 1, 2009, include in the |
---|
40 | 40 | | municipality's annexation plan each unincorporated area that is |
---|
41 | 41 | | entirely surrounded by the incorporated territory of the |
---|
42 | 42 | | municipality; and |
---|
43 | 43 | | (2) not later than December 1, 2012, annex each area |
---|
44 | 44 | | described by Subdivision (1). |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) Not later than January 1, 2010, a municipality described |
---|
46 | 46 | | by Subsection (a) shall disannex each area that was annexed by the |
---|
47 | 47 | | municipality on or after January 1, 2002, unless: |
---|
48 | 48 | | (1) the area is compact; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | (2) the addition of the area to the municipality |
---|
50 | 50 | | serves the goal of creating a single compact municipal area. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (c) For purposes of this section, the area to be annexed is |
---|
52 | 52 | | compact if it is concentrated in a single area. The addition of an |
---|
53 | 53 | | area to a municipality serves the goal of creating a single compact |
---|
54 | 54 | | municipal area if the action does not create enclaves, pockets, or |
---|
55 | 55 | | finger areas. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2013. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
58 | 58 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
59 | 59 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
60 | 60 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
61 | 61 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|