Senate | 05/21/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2614 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3730 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#878 | Journal Page: 3730 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3730 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3730 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3711 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3711 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3711 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3593 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 318 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 318 | |
House | 12/22/2008 | Filed |