E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1675
|
Journal Page: 6548
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6542
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2995
|
Journal Page: 6540
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6900
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5013
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1102
|
Journal Page: 5012
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4556
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4556
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5204
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Averitt
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#550
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
13-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amended
|
12-Button, Cook, and Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
9-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
9-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#533
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
7-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
4-Isett and Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
5-Isett
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 21
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/2/09 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 21
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 347
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 347
|
House
|
12/22/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|