House | 05/22/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 4324 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1483 | Journal Page: 4324 |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 960 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 960 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Filed |