E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4310
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1379
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#223
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|