E | 05/27/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5217 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4221 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3970 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3717 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2408 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2408 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2408 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2408 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2408 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2408 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2408 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2104 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2606 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | RV#610 | Journal Page: 2605 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2539 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2539 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 318 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 318 | |
House | 12/29/2008 | Filed |