E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1479
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5202
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|