E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5214 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2917 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2917 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2917 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2917 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2759 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3217 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3217 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3217 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3198 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3198 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2870 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Filed |